PA HB503 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for eligibility and incompatible offices for school directors.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for eligibility and incompatible offices for school directors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-05-06 | First consideration | |
2008-05-06 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-27 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2007-04-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-18 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-17 | Second consideration | |
2007-03-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-19 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-19 | First consideration | |
2007-03-19 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=503 |