PA HB510 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-11 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.
Title
Amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for power to convey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-23 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-23 | First consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |