PA HB533 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions.
Title
Further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2012-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |