PA HB59 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Re-referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 8, 1978 (P.L.752, No.140), known as the Public Employee Pension Forfeiture Act, further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for disqualification and forfeiture of benefits and for restitution for monetary loss; and repealing a retroactivity provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House State Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseRe-referred to JUDICIARY
2019-02-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY
2019-01-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback