PA HB617 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for a volunteer instructor license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 617 PN 612, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 617 PN 612, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2019-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-03-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-03-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |