PA HB62 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-16)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in grants to fire companies and volunteer services, further providing for award of grants to eligible fire companies and volunteer ambulance services.
Title
In grants to fire companies and volunteer services, further providing for award of grants to eligible fire companies and volunteer ambulance services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 62 PN 1564, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01547 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01547 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 62 PN 1564, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01547 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01547 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-09-25 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2015-09-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-09-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-07-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-07-22 | House | Second consideration |
2015-07-21 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |