PA HB634 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-10)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-04-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for conditional certification of persons by the Department of Education.
Title
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for conditional certification of persons by the Department of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-04-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-16 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-16 | First consideration | |
2007-04-16 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-06 | Referred to EDUCATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=634 |