PA HB646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Title
In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 646 PN 689, FP (Y: 188 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 646 PN 689, FP (Y: 188 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-6) |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |