PA HB66 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 1012 over the Lackawanna River, Archbald Borough, Lackawanna County, as the Police Chief Thomas J. Malone Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 1012 over the Lackawanna River, Archbald Borough, Lackawanna County, as the Police Chief Thomas J. Malone Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - Senate - HB 66 PN 30, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - HB 66 PN 30, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - HB 66 PN 30, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 31 |
2011-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2011-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-04 | House | Second consideration |
2011-03-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-09 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |