PA HB758 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judgments and other liens, further providing for personal earnings exempt from process; and, in sentencing, further providing for payment of court costs, restitution and fines.
Title
In judgments and other liens, further providing for personal earnings exempt from process; and, in sentencing, further providing for payment of court costs, restitution and fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 758 PN 1880, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 758 PN 1825, 2015 A2255, PETRARCA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 758 PN 1880, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 758 PN 1825, 2015 A2255, PETRARCA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01892 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-16 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |