PA HB758 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4018 over the Little Mahoning Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the SP4 Franklin Delano Meyer Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 4018 over the Little Mahoning Creek, South Mahoning Township, Indiana County, as the SP4 Franklin Delano Meyer Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 758 PN 808, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-04-29SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-04-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-17HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-10HouseReported as committed
2019-03-08HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback