PA HB763 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 1, 1945 (P.L.1242, No.428), known as the State Highway Law, in construction, improvement, maintenance and repair of State highways, providing for native vegetation along highways.
Title
In construction, improvement, maintenance and repair of State highways, providing for native vegetation along highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 763 PN 749, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 763 PN 749, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-10-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-10-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-06 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |