PA HB792 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Act No. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Corrections, to grant and convey to Schuylkill County certain lands situate in Ryan Township, Schuylkill County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor and the Department of Corrections, to grant and convey to Schuylkill County certain lands situate in Ryan Township, Schuylkill County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-08 - House - HB 792 PN 2676, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-24 - Senate - HB 792 PN 2676, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - House - HB 792 PN 883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-24 - Senate - HB 792 PN 2676, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - House - HB 792 PN 883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-09 | Act No. 46 | |
2009-10-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-10-08 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-10-08 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-10-08 | Signed in House | |
2009-10-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2009-09-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-28 | Referred to RULES | |
2009-09-24 | In the House | |
2009-09-24 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-09-23 | Second consideration | |
2009-09-17 | First consideration | |
2009-09-17 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-20 | In the Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-04-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-31 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-31 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-30 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-30 | First consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |