PA HB83 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-14)
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-13 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-13 - Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, providing for reporting requirements; further providing for Assistance Recipient Identification Program; providing for income eligibility verification system; further providing for local administration of assistance; providing for fraud detection system and for residency and county assistance offices; and requiring the Department of Public Welfare to provide personal care home information on the department's Internet website.
Title
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, providing for reporting requirements; further providing for Assistance Recipient Identification Program; providing for income eligibility verification system; further providing for local administration of assistance; providing for fraud detection system and for residency and county assistance offices; and requiring the Department of Public Welfare to provide personal care home information on the department's Internet website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-13 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2007-07-12 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-07-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-07-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-21 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-21 | First consideration | |
2007-06-21 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=83 |