PA HB85 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 3
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 3
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS), certain lands situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County, in exchange for a certain tract of land from COLTS situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County.
Title
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the County of Lackawanna Transit System Authority (COLTS), certain lands situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County, in exchange for a certain tract of land from COLTS situate in the City of Scranton, Lackawanna County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-16 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-05-09 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-05-08 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-05-07 | Signed in House | |
2007-05-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-30 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-23 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-03-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-11-20 | Second consideration, March 19, 2007 | |
2007-03-19 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-02-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-02-12 | First consideration | |
2007-02-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=85 |