PA HB917 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed in House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed in House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adopting the Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.
Title
Adopting the Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 917 PN 2874, CONCURRENCE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 917 PN 2874, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02925 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 917 PN 1151, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 917 PN 905, 2023 A443 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 917 PN 2874, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02925 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Floor: HB 917 PN 1151, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 917 PN 905, 2023 A443 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed in House |
2024-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2024-04-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to RULES |
2024-04-09 | House | In the House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2023-05-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-03 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2023-04-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-04-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |