PA HB948 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-11-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for vouchers for licenses.
Title
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for vouchers for licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-20 | First consideration | |
2007-11-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-13 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2007-10-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-23 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-10-23 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-06 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-09 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-09 | First consideration | |
2007-05-09 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-29 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=948 |