PA HB956 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in State lottery, further providing for powers and duties of secretary.
Title
In State lottery, further providing for powers and duties of secretary.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Murt [R] | Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Stanley Saylor [R] |
Rep. Mark Rozzi [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 956 PN 2191, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 956 PN 2191, FP (Y: 188 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 956 PN 1081, 2019 A1956, JONES (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-23 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 956 PN 2191, FP (Y: 188 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 956 PN 1081, 2019 A1956, JONES (Y: 196 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 97 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-4) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |