PA HB962 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Act No. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, reforming remedies for victims of sexual abuse: in limitation of time, further providing for six months limitation, for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity, for limitations on damages in actions against Commonwealth parties, for exceptions to governmental immunity and for limitations on damages in actions against local parties; in sentencing alternatives, providing for counseling services for victims of sexual abuse; and transferring money from the General Fund into the Crime Victim's Compensation Fund.
Title
Reforming remedies for victims of sexual abuse: in limitation of time, further providing for six months limitation, for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity, for limitations on damages in actions against Commonwealth parties, for exceptions to governmental immunity and for limitations on damages in actions against local parties; in sentencing alternatives, providing for counseling services for victims of sexual abuse; and transferring money from the General Fund into the Crime Victim's Compensation Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Rozzi [D] | Rep. James Gregory [R] | Rep. Timothy Briggs [D] | Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D] |
Rep. Liz Hanbidge [D] | Rep. Joseph Webster [D] | Rep. Ben Sanchez [D] | Rep. Brian Sims [D] |
Rep. Tina Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 2938, CONCUR (Y: 182 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2938, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3953, KEARNEY AMENDMENT NO. A-3953 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3961, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3961 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3954, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3954 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A4106, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-4106 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 1352, FP (Y: 187 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 1187, 2019 A662, GREGORY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 2938, CONCUR (Y: 182 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2938, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3953, KEARNEY AMENDMENT NO. A-3953 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3961, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3961 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A3954, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-3954 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 962 PN 2891, A4106, BAKER AMENDMENT NO. A-4106 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 1352, FP (Y: 187 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 962 PN 1187, 2019 A662, GREGORY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Act No. 87 |
2019-11-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (182-5) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-20 | House | In the House |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-5) |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-03 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1187 |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |