PA HB965 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-23 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-23 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 965 PN 1885, FP (Y: 113 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 965 PN 1885, 2015 A2556, VITALI (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 965 PN 1885, FP (Y: 113 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Floor: HB 965 PN 1885, 2015 A2556, VITALI (Y: 80 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-23 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2015-10-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-84) |
2015-10-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-19 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-07 | House | Removed from table |
2015-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |