PA HB975 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, adding definitions; further providing for general powers of board and for procedure for licensing as professional geologist; providing for continuing professional competency and education requirements; and further providing for practice by firms and corporations.
Title
Adding definitions; further providing for general powers of board and for procedure for licensing as professional geologist; providing for continuing professional competency and education requirements; and further providing for practice by firms and corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - HB 975 PN 2060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - House - HB 975 PN 2060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - House - HB 975 PN 2060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Act No. 25 | |
2010-05-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Signed in House | |
2010-05-04 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-04-20 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-02-03 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-02 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2009-08-19 | In the Senate | |
2009-08-19 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-08-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-11 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-29 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-29 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |