PA HR107 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Adopted, May 24, 2023 201-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Adopted, May 24, 2023 201-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating May 24, 2023, as "Emergency Medical Services for Children (EMSC) Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating May 24, 2023, as "Emergency Medical Services for Children (EMSC) Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - House Floor: HR 107 PN 1211 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-report Resolution As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-report Resolution As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Adopted, May 24, 2023 201-0 |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |