PA HR269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish a bipartisan task force to study any consolidated or unconsolidated State statutes in the Pennsylvania Crimes Code, Judicial Code, Sentencing Code or elsewhere under which a term of imprisonment and other collateral consequences may be imposed in order to identify redundant, overlapping and inconsistent offenses, improper grading and gaps in criminal liability, out-of-date, antiquated, offensive or unenforceable language and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish a bipartisan task force to study any consolidated or unconsolidated State statutes in the Pennsylvania Crimes Code, Judicial Code, Sentencing Code or elsewhere under which a term of imprisonment and other collateral consequences may be imposed in order to identify redundant, overlapping and inconsistent offenses, improper grading and gaps in criminal liability, out-of-date, antiquated, offensive or unenforceable language and to make recommendations to the General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2882 (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3832 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3824 (Y: 100 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3911 (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03131 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3832 (Y: 99 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3824 (Y: 100 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HR 269 PN 2394, 2023 A3911 (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-08 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03131 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2024-04-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-09 | House | Adopted (102-99) |
2024-04-09 | House | Amended |
2023-12-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-11-30 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |