PA HR45 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-02-12 - Adopted
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-02-12 - Adopted
Summary
A Resolution honoring the life and extending condolences for the supreme sacrifice of United States Army Major Michael Lewis Mundell of the 1st Marine Expeditionary Force, who tragically lost his life in service to our country in Iraq on January 5, 2007.
Title
A Resolution honoring the life and extending condolences for the supreme sacrifice of United States Army Major Michael Lewis Mundell of the 1st Marine Expeditionary Force, who tragically lost his life in service to our country in Iraq on January 5, 2007.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-02-12 | Adopted | |
2007-02-05 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 273 | |
2007-02-01 | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=R&bn=45 |