PA HR550 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Adopted (199-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Adopted (199-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish a bipartisan legislative task force and an advisory committee to conduct a study of the occurrence, effects and trends of homelessness in Pennsylvania and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish a bipartisan legislative task force and an advisory committee to conduct a study of the occurrence, effects and trends of homelessness in Pennsylvania and to report its findings and recommendations to the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Adopted (199-2) |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-11 | House | Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2013-11-13 | House | Referred to HEALTH |