PA HR654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Adopted (195-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing February 25, 2020, as "World Spay Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing February 25, 2020, as "World Spay Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HR 654 PN 3089 (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Adopted (195-0) |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |