PA SB1048 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-03 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 2005 (P.L.474, No.94), known as the Breach of Personal Information Notification Act, further providing for title of act, for definitions and for notification of breach; prohibiting employees of the Commonwealth from using nonsecured Internet connections; and providing for encryption required, for Commonwealth policy and for entities subject to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996.
Title
Further providing for title of act, for definitions and for notification of breach; prohibiting employees of the Commonwealth from using nonsecured Internet connections; and providing for encryption required, for Commonwealth policy and for entities subject to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1048 PN 2079, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-03 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2016-09-28 | House | In the House |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |