PA SB1076 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military leave of absence, further providing for military family relief assistance.
Title
In military leave of absence, further providing for military family relief assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1076 PN 2113, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 2113, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, 2019 A7791, BARRAR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, 2019 A7791, SUSP RULES, BARRAR (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, MOT RECON, BARRAR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1076 PN 2113, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 2113, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, 2019 A7791, BARRAR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, 2019 A7791, SUSP RULES, BARRAR (Y: 199 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, MOT RECON, BARRAR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1076 PN 1560, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 104 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Final passage (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Amended on third consideration |
2020-10-21 | House | Vote on final passage reconsidered (201-0) |
2020-10-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-08 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-05-28 | House | In the House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |