PA SB1086 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for display of registration plate and for surrender of registration plates and cards upon suspension or revocation and providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; and, in fees, further providing for reinstatement of operating privilege or vehicle registration.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for display of registration plate and for surrender of registration plates and cards upon suspension or revocation and providing for suspension of registration upon unpaid tolls; and, in fees, further providing for reinstatement of operating privilege or vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A10594 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A10516 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1086 PN 1509, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A10594 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A10516 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1086 PN 1509, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-10-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-09-27 | House | In the House |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |