PA SB1113 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in administration, further providing for committee.
Title
In administration, further providing for committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1113 PN 1513, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-14 | House | In the House |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |