PA SB1118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for broadband services.
Title
Providing for broadband services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |