PA SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing Recovery-to-work as a pilot program within the Department of Labor and Industry; and providing for local recovery-to-work pilot programs, for incentives to encourage business participation and for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry.
Title
Establishing Recovery-to-work as a pilot program within the Department of Labor and Industry; and providing for local recovery-to-work pilot programs, for incentives to encourage business participation and for powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 118 PN 998, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2019-06-18 | House | In the House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-16) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 937 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |