PA SB1187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for qualifications for license.
Title
Further providing for qualifications for license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |