PA SB1258 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-03 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-09-21 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |