PA SB1331 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the licensure of limited lines travel insurance producers, for requirements for sale of travel insurance, for authority of limited lines travel insurance producers, for registration and training of travel retailers and for renewal of license.
Title
Providing for the licensure of limited lines travel insurance producers, for requirements for sale of travel insurance, for authority of limited lines travel insurance producers, for registration and training of travel retailers and for renewal of license.
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1331 PN 2166, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2016-10-25 | House | In the House |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |