PA SB1365 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, increasing the number of judges in certain judicial districts.
Title
In organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, increasing the number of judges in certain judicial districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Patricia Vance [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Charles McIlhinney [R] | Sen. Robert Tomlinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1365 PN 2168, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1365 PN 2068, A10667, MCILHINNEY AMENDMENT NO. A-10667 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1365 PN 2168, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1365 PN 2068, A10667, MCILHINNEY AMENDMENT NO. A-10667 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-18 | House | In the House |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-2) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (46-2) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |