PA SB138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 20, 1979 (P.L.183, No.60), known as the Oil and Gas Lease Act, further providing for definitions, for payment information to interest owners, for accumulation of proceeds from production and for conflicts and providing for joint ventures and for inspection of records.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for payment information to interest owners, for accumulation of proceeds from production and for conflicts and providing for joint ventures and for inspection of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 138 PN 92, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2017-01-30 | House | In the House |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |