PA SB190 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Jeffrey C. Walker, certain lands situate in Somerset Township, Somerset County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Jeffrey C. Walker, certain lands situate in Somerset Township, Somerset County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 190 PN 145, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 190 PN 145, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 190 PN 145, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 190 PN 145, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 27 |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-12 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-19 | House | In the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |