PA SB191 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 191 PN 442, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 191 PN 442, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 191 PN 442, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-03-24 | House | In the House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Final passage (28-19) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-18) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |