PA SB196 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in protection from abuse, providing for the definition of "electronic monitoring device" and further providing for relief.
Title
In protection from abuse, providing for the definition of "electronic monitoring device" and further providing for relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 196 PN 185, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-12-12 | House | In the House |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |