PA SB202 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act No. 4 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act No. 4 of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 16, 1923 (P.L.207, No.153), referred to as the Municipal Claim and Tax Lien Law, further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing for disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Title
Further providing for municipal claims first lien, cities of first class, docketing, judgment and execution, for cities of the first class, recovery of judgment and sale free from claims, for redemption and for rule to show cause, decree, service and notice and providing for disposition of property in cities of the second class.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Lindsey Williams [D] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. James Brewster [D] |
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Nikil Saval [D] | Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 202 PN 83, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 149 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 202 PN 83, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 202 PN 83, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 149 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 202 PN 83, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | House | Act No. 4 of 2023 |
2023-07-05 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-06-28 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2023-06-27 | House | Signed in House |
2023-06-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2023-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (149-53) |
2023-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-20 | House | Removed from table |
2023-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-13 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-06-07 | House | In the House |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |