PA SB21 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 4
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 4
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to enter into an agreement or other legal instrument with Chester County to alter use restrictions and reversionary covenants on real estate conveyed to Chester County, situate in Newlin and West Bradford Townships; and making inconsistent repeals.
Title
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to enter into an agreement or other legal instrument with Chester County to alter use restrictions and reversionary covenants on real estate conveyed to Chester County, situate in Newlin and West Bradford Townships; and making inconsistent repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Brubaker [R] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] |
Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-05-23 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-05-23 | Signed in House | |
2007-05-22 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-05-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-05-21 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-07 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-07 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-24 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-24 | First consideration | |
2007-04-24 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-22 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2007-03-19 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-13 | Second consideration | |
2007-02-13 | First consideration | |
2007-02-13 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-29 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=21 |