PA SB228 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for museum unclaimed loaned property.
Title
Providing for museum unclaimed loaned property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 228 PN 197, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2024-02-07 | House | In the House |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |