PA SB24 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for claim for property paid or delivered.
Title
In disposition of abandoned and unclaimed property, further providing for claim for property paid or delivered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 24 PN 403, 2023 A3302, MOTION TO SUSPEND RULES (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 24 PN 403, 2023 A3250 (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 24 PN 403, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 24 PN 403, 2023 A3250 (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 24 PN 403, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-12-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2023-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-12-11 | House | First consideration |
2023-12-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2023-06-06 | House | In the House |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |