PA SB286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-09 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 20 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-09 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," further providing for the Delaware River Joint Commission, for composition, for employees, for financing and for executive sessions; providing for majority approval and contract procedures; further providing for report; providing for conflicts of interest, for master plan and creating the Port Authority Transit Corporation Commuter's Council; further providing for definitions; authorizing the Governor to apply for approval; prohibiting the entrance into a compact until passage of a similar act; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," further providing for the Delaware River Joint Commission, for composition, for employees, for financing and for executive sessions; providing for majority approval and contract procedures; further providing for report; providing for conflicts of interest, for master plan and creating the Port Authority Transit Corporation Commuter's Council; further providing for definitions; authorizing the Governor to apply for approval; prohibiting the entrance into a compact until passage of a similar act; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] |
Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 286 PN 1437, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 286 PN 1437, FP (Y: 117 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Floor: SB 286 PN 1437, 2015 A4560, KELLER, W. (Y: 77 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03125 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03581 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03581 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03125 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 286 PN 499, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 286 PN 1437, FP (Y: 117 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Floor: SB 286 PN 1437, 2015 A4560, KELLER, W. (Y: 77 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03125 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03581 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03581 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03125 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 286 PN 499, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | House | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2016-10-28 | House | In the Senate |
2016-10-28 | Senate | Veto No. 5 |
2016-10-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (37-13) |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (117-73) |
2016-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-12-01 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-12-01 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-14 | House | In the House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |