PA SB316 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, providing for public access to procurement records; and, in source selection and contract formation, further providing for sole source procurement and for emergency procurement and providing for legal services contracts.
Title
In general provisions, providing for public access to procurement records; and, in source selection and contract formation, further providing for sole source procurement and for emergency procurement and providing for legal services contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A3873, ACOSTA (Y: 177 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4084, NEUMAN (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4557, BLOOM (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4156, GABLER (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03758 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03758 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 316 PN 206, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A3873, ACOSTA (Y: 177 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4084, NEUMAN (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4557, BLOOM (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Floor: SB 316 PN 1369, 2015 A4156, GABLER (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03758 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03758 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 316 PN 206, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-01-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-01-27 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-12-24 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-07 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-27 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-23 | House | In the House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |