PA SB338 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for width of vehicles.
Title
In size, weight and load, further providing for width of vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: SB 338 PN 503, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 338 PN 503, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: SB 338 PN 503, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 338 PN 503, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Act No. 28 |
2019-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | Signed in House |
2019-06-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-08 | House | In the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |