PA SB352 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-25 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Summary
An Act providing for Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program eligibility, allocation of funds and resources; imposing duties on the Department of Public Welfare; and providing for compliance and fraud prevention procedures and for performance audit and allocation of appropriations.
Title
An Act providing for Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program eligibility, allocation of funds and resources; imposing duties on the Department of Public Welfare; and providing for compliance and fraud prevention procedures and for performance audit and allocation of appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-25 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2008-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-11 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-02 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-04-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-25 | First consideration | |
2007-04-25 | Reported as committed | |
2007-03-12 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=352 |