PA SB360 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania Community College Affordability Advisory Council within the Department of Education; and providing for its powers and duties and for administrative support.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania Community College Affordability Advisory Council within the Department of Education; and providing for its powers and duties and for administrative support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |