PA SB365 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.
Title
In interpretation and definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in liability and compensation, providing for compensation for post-traumatic stress injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01496 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Removed from table |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Removed from table |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2023-06-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |